Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction during the marriage of the child's mother with the consent of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses for all purposes; providing that a child conceived by means of assisted reproduction after the death of the mother's spouse and using the genetic material of the mother's spouse is the legitimate child of both spouses under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0697
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {472419/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-6)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text - First - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {472419/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {708576/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (32-13) 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13) 59A
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-6) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-201, 1-201.1, 1-206, 1-208, 1-208.1, 3-108 )
(   5-1001, 5-1005, 5-1027, 5-1028, 5-3B-01, 5-3B-16, 5-3B-17, 5-3B-27 )
(   4-201, 4-208, 4-211, 4-223 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM