Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldman, Arora, Barkley, Dumais, Reznik, Conway, Proctor, Bohanan, James, Gaines, Guzzone, Jones, Haynes, Gutierrez, Zucker, Griffith, DeBoy, Sophocleus, B. Robinson, Mizeur, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish a Transportation Trust Fund to be used only for purposes relating to transportation except under specified circumstances; prohibiting the transfer of funds in the Transportation Trust Fund to the General Fund or a special fund of the State except under specified circumstances; providing that the amendment does not apply to the allocation or use of specified funds in the Transportation Trust Fund for counties, municipalities, and Baltimore City under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0643
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0011 Session: 2012 2nd Special Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154766/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {143727/1 Rejected (53-86)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {893523/1 Rejected (49-90)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {973226/2 Rejected (49-89)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {373523/1 Rejected (44-87)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {783422/1 Rejected (46-84)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Conway) {293826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {973226/1 Rejected (53-82)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-27)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {154766/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {143727/1 Rejected (53-86) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate George) {893523/1 Rejected (49-90) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {973226/2 Rejected (49-89) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {373523/1 Rejected (44-87) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {783422/1 Rejected (46-84) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Conway) {293826/1 Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {973226/1 Rejected (53-82) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (110-27) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM