Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Lam, McCray, Stein, and Szeliga
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which a motor vehicle dealer's failure to comply with specified requirements constitutes grounds for denial of a specified claim or reduction of the amount of specified compensation; prohibiting a motor vehicle manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from taking specified action against a dealer for the provision of specified information to specified persons; specifying that a dealer may provide specified information only to a specified customer; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {340111/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {343426/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {233622/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {608575/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {303625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {573923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {340111/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {343426/1 Withdrawn 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Special Order until 3/21 (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {233622/1 Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {608575/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {303625/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {573923/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-212, 15-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM