Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Department of Public Works - Smart Water Meters
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Harford County Department of Public Works to provide each affected customer with written notice of the intention of the Department to install smart water meters; establishing a process by which a specified customer will be deemed to have given permission to the Department to install a smart water meter on the customer's premises; requiring the Department to pay to a customer $500 if the Department installs a smart water meter on the customer's premises without permission; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1292 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM