Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Wage Records, Wages, and Paydays - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Barkley, Conaway, Glenn, McCray, Morales, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring employers to keep wage records for each pay period for at least three years; expanding the types of wage records that employers are required to keep for each pay period; requiring employers to give employees a specified written notice within 10 days of hiring; expanding the information that employers are required to give to employees at the time of hiring and for each pay period; requiring employers to provide employees with an explanation of how wages were calculated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-424, 3-427, 3-504, 3-507.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM