Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Name of the Individual
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing, for purposes of a provision of law prohibiting a person from knowingly, willfully, and with fraudulent intent, possessing, obtaining, or helping another to possess or obtain personal identifying information for specified purposes, a limitation that a specified benefit, credit, good, service, thing of value, health information, or health care be obtained or accessed in the name of an individual.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 42
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM