Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Mail Theft - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully removing, taking, possessing, obtaining, or receiving mail under specified circumstances without the permission of the United States Postal Service or the intended recipient of the mail; providing penalties for a violation of the Act; repealing a provision that prohibits opening a letter without permission that is rendered inconsistent with the Act; providing that a prosecution under the Act does not preclude a prosecution for theft; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0272 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-905, 7-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM