Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Hixson, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Moon, Platt, M. Washington, Mosby, Tarlau, A. Washington, Lierman, Turner, Ali, D. Barnes, C. Howard, Walker, Wilkins, Patterson, and Carr
Status
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to authorize the General Assembly to allow a qualified individual to register and vote at a precinct polling place on Election Day; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0594
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {585467/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {273726/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (50-84)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {883428/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-47)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-34)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {585467/1 Adopted 38
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 38
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {273726/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (50-84) 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {883428/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted 40
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (91-47) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable 51
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-34) 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 855
Text - Chapter - Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM