Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Brand Name Prescription Drugs for Mental Health Treatment
Sponsored by
Delegate Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified health insurance entities to establish and implement a specified procedure that provides for coverage of prescription drugs prescribed for the treatment of a mental disease or condition under specified conditions; prohibiting specified health insurance entities from imposing specified cost-sharing requirements on coverage for specified brand name prescription drugs that are less favorable to a member than the cost-sharing requirements that apply to coverage for specified equivalent generic prescription drugs; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-831 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM