Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award and Walter Sondheim Jr. Public Service Internship Scholarship - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Luedtke, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to assist in the repayment of specified higher education loans owed by recipients of a Nancy Grasmick Teacher Award who receive specified degrees from specified institutions of higher education; adding specified individuals who attended specified institutions of higher education and also graduated from specified high schools in the State to the list of individuals eligible for a specified repayment program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0329 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1502, 18-1701, 18-1702, 18-1704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM