Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County to allow an approved applicant to transfer an alcoholic beverages license to other premises within one-half mile of the premises for which the license was issued if the premises is substantially destroyed by fire, explosion, or catastrophe, taken by condemnation, taken by the exercise of the power of eminent domain, or no longer leased by the license holder due to the delay of a court case or other administrative process delay; and applying the Act retroactively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0194
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633799/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {563324/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {633799/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Floor Amendment {563324/1 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Liquor Licenses - Transfer of License
(   11-102, 11-1701, 11-1702 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page