Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure Sale
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the person authorized to make a foreclosure sale to give written notice of the proposed sale to a specified condominium or homeowners association that, at least 30 days before the date of the proposed sale, has recorded a statement of lien against the property; requiring the trustee, within 14 days after the postponement or cancellation of a foreclosure sale, to send a notice that the sale was postponed or canceled to the record owner and, if applicable, to the specified condominium or homeowners association by pre-paid mail; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {330712/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {330712/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM