Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
Sponsored by
Delegate Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to choose not to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes certain actions conducted on a certain animal; authorizing a student to choose not to participate in or observe the classwork or assessment at a certain time; requiring a certain student to complete the required classwork or assessment by a certain alternative educational method that meets certain requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM