Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric and Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Investments
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Davis, Frick, Impallaria, Jameson, Lisanti, Mautz, W. Miller, Valderrama, and Vaughn
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to a maximum amount of $4, up from $2, a specified monthly natural gas surcharge for specified retail natural gas customers; authorizing an electric company to recover specified costs associated with specified electric system infrastructure investments through a specified electric system infrastructure investment surcharge on customer bills; requiring electric system infrastructure investment cost calculations to include specified elements; specifying when costs shall be collectible; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0510
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-210, 4-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM