Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial Inspection
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Atterbeary, Brooks, Ciliberti, Ebersole, Frush, Glenn, Hill, Hixson, Lam, Lisanti, B. Robinson, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the vehicle emissions control program, at the time of a vehicle's biennial emissions test and inspection, to provide for specified additional inspections of the vehicle's tires, exterior lights, and windshield wipers; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration and the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations that define the inspection parameters and establish a schedule for the additional inspection of vehicle tires, exterior lights, and windshield wipers; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-202, 23-203, 23-204, 23-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM