Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Content and Scope of Practice
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Cullison, Kelly, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain formulary developed by the Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council and adopted by the State Board of Physicians to include certain prescription drugs and devices; authorizing a licensed naturopathic doctor to dispense, order, or administer certain natural medicines in a certain manner; and authorizing a licensed naturopathic doctor to prescribe, dispense, and administer certain prescription drugs and medical foods in a certain manner.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0900
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Formulary Content and Scope of Practice
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-5F-04.1, 14-5F-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM