Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Unpaid Water and Sanitary Charges - Collection
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the tax collectors in Baltimore City and Baltimore County to withhold a residential property from a tax sale when the lien on the property arises solely from specified unpaid water, sewer, and sanitary system charges, fees, or assessments and the total amount of the lien is less than $750; and repealing the prohibition against the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City from selling a property solely to enforce a specified lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service under specified circumstances.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0145
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-658, 9-662, 9-724, 9-726 )
(   14-811, 14-849.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM