Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure Act
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Pena-Melnyk, and Reznik
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring corporations that receive at least $50,000 in specified State subsidies to file a specified disclosure report with the granting body that provides the subsidy; requiring the disclosure report to contain specified information; requiring the disclosure report to be provided on or before December 31 of each year during which the recipient corporation receives a State subsidy; requiring a granting body to publish a compilation of the disclosure reports on its Web site on or before April 1 of each year; defining terms; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1086 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM