Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Angel, Atterbeary, Brooks, Carr, Cassilly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Hayes, Hettleman, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a store from distributing plastic disposable carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; requiring a store to charge and collect a 10-cent fee for each paper disposable carryout bag the store provides to a customer; authorizing a store to retain a specified amount of a specified fee under specified circumstances; prohibiting a store from advertising or stating specified information under specified circumstances; requiring a store to include specified information on specified receipts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0620
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM