Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Beidle, Chang, and Sophocleus
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $20,000 to $60,000 the salary of an attorney employed by the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board to hire an attorney on a contractual basis to perform work that the attorney employed by the Board is unable to perform because of a conflict of interest; and prohibiting the Board from spending more than $30,000 each year to hire a contractual attorney.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0374
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-27)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (110-27) 47
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 59
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM