Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on Highways
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, Parrott, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, McMillan, Norman, Stein, Wilson, Beitzel, Glenn, K. Kelly, A. Miller, Myers, and Healey
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 65 miles an hour to 70 miles an hour the maximum speed limit that may be established on specified highways in the State.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0157
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1346 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {880511/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {880511/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 31
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-801.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM