Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Angel, S. Howard, Kipke, Malone, and McConkey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, beginning with the 2018 general election, specified members of the Anne Arundel County Board of Education be elected by districts and specified members be appointed; establishing the composition of the county board; providing for residency requirements and terms of office; repealing specified provisions of law establishing and relating to the School Board Nominating Commission of Anne Arundel County; providing for the expiration of the terms of specified appointed members of the county board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-108, 3-110, 3-114, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-03, 3-2A-01 through 3-2A-10, 3-2A-06, 3-2B-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM