Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, pending a determination by a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child whether to transfer its jurisdiction to the juvenile court, provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile records apply to all police records and court records concerning the child; and repealing provisions of law relating to the expungement of criminal charges transferred to the juvenile court.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as Adults
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-106, 4-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM