Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Threatening Juror, Witness, or Officer of Court for Performance of Duty - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Barron, and Moon
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a person may not threaten, intimidate, impede, or injure a juror, a witness, or an officer of a court of the State or of the United States for any reason related to the performance by the juror, witness, or officer of that person's official duties; prohibiting a person from soliciting another person to violate the Act; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment, not to exceed 5 years, or a maximum fine of $5,000, or both.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM