Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Public Service Commission to conduct certain hearings relating to certain rate increases virtually; authorizing the Commission to conduct certain public hearings relating to certain certificates of public convenience and necessity virtually in a certain manner; requiring the Commission to provide information on the virtual hearings prominently on the Commission's website; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
11AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Virtual Public Hearings
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 11AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Finance 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:57 PM
Click to return on the top page