Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore City Police Department
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Ali, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Gibson, Hayes, Haynes, Lierman, McIntosh, Mosby, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct an audit of the Baltimore City Police Department to evaluate the effectiveness and efficiency of the financial management practices of the Department beginning July 1, 2019, and at least once every 6 years thereafter; and requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to provide certain information to the Baltimore City Police Department.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore City Police Department
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore City Police Department
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM