Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Surplus Lines - Disability Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell and Kipke
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the use of surplus lines insurance for disability insurance coverage under specified circumstances; providing that the procurement of specified disability insurance through surplus lines insurance is subject to specified requirements; providing that the Act applies to all policies and contracts of surplus lines insurance for disability insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-302, 3-306.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM