Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State to issue video lottery operation licenses to holders of specified alcoholic beverages licenses; altering the number of video lottery terminals that may be authorized in the State; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to supervise, administer, and license the operation of specified video lottery terminals; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1010 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-05, 9-1A-27, 9-1A-36 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM