Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Barron, Crutchfield, Ghrist, Kelly, Krebs, R. Lewis, Patterson, K. Young, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a behavioral health program licensed as an outpatient mental health center to satisfy any regulatory requirement that a medical director be on-site through the use of telehealth by the director.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0178
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {596783/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {413929/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {596783/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Finance 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Floor Amendment {413929/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text - Chapter - Outpatient Mental Health Centers – Medical Directors – Telehealth
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM