Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Counselors - Role Expansion in Public Middle and High Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Barkley, Barnes, Bates, Carr, Clagett, Healey, Luedtke, Reznik, Sophocleus, F. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Setting forth a goal of the State to achieve, by 2020, a ratio of at least one school counselor to every 250 students in every public middle and high school in the State; requiring each local school system to develop and adopt a plan on or before December 1, 2016 on how to achieve the ratio; expressing a goal of the State that specified school counselors spend at least 80% of their time on direct services to students; authorizing each local school system to share resources and technology available for school counselors; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Contingency - on funding
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175469/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-43)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {175469/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDermott) Adopted 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 44
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM