Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley and W. Miller
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Public Service Commission, when determining specified expenses while setting a just and reasonable rate for a gas company, to include all costs reasonably incurred by the gas company for performing environmental remediation of real property in response to a State or federal law, regulation, or order under specified conditions; authorizing that specified environmental remediation costs be included in a gas company's specified expenses regardless of specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623898/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827773/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827773/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {493727/1 Adopted (28-18)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {463625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {623898/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 53
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 51
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {827773/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {493727/1 Adopted (28-18) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {463625/1 Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton) 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM