Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Adams, Afzali, Anderson, Anderton, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, Barron, Beidle, Beitzel, Buckel, Carey, Carozza, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Dumais, Ebersole, Fisher, Flanagan, Folden, Frush, Ghrist, Gibson, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jackson, Jacobs, Jameson, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Morhaim, Mosby, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Proctor, Queen, Reilly, Robinson, Rose, Saab, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Sydnor, Szeliga, Vogt, Wilson, P. Young, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $750 to $1,500 the maximum allowable amount of a credit against the State income tax that provides $5 for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during a taxable year; extending the termination date of the credit to June 30, 2021; and providing for the application of certain provisions of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {365168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {349732/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {365168/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {349732/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Walker, Buckel and Ebersole) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Senate Recede 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Committee Amendment {349732/1 Withdrawn 62AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Recede 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
(   10-724.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page