Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Required Notices - Method of Mailing
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
Veto sustained (0-135)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the method of mailing that an insurer or a vendor is required to use when the insurer or vendor sends to a policyholder or covered customer specified notices about a termination or any other change in the terms and conditions of a policy of portable electronics insurance.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0541
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-135)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/17/2017 Veto sustained (0-135)
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM