Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Carr, Barkley, Chang, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gutierrez, C. Howard, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Morales, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a pedestrian hybrid beacon is a traffic control signal; establishing that specified provisions of law do not apply to pedestrian hybrid beacons; authorizing the State Highway Administration or a local jurisdiction to install a pedestrian hybrid beacon in accordance with the federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0338
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Signals
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {460514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Signals
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {460514/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Pedestrian Hybrid Beacons
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
(   11-145.1, 11-168, 21-202, 21-204, 21-204.2, 21-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page