Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the definitions of "franchise" and "technology-based business"; making conforming changes to specified findings of the General Assembly, the purpose of the Equity Participation Investment Program, the authority of the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority, and the contents of a specified business plan; repealing specified distinctions in the amount the Authority may invest in specified enterprises using equity participation financing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433394/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {433394/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Special Order until 2/20 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 31
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 35
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Finance 34
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-549, 5-550, 5-551, 5-552, 5-553, 5-554, 5-556, 5-557 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM