Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Subcontractor Equal Access to Bonding Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Bromwell, Costa, Cullison, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, Frick, Healey, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Ready, B. Robinson, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a prime contractor from requiring specified bonding from a subcontractor on specified procurement contracts that is more stringent than specified bonding requirements for prime contractors on specified procurement contracts under a specified circumstance; requiring a contractor to accept specified bonding from a subcontractor under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {206785/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {206785/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM