Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Sponsored by
Delegates Carozza, Atterbeary, Kramer, McComas, Valentino-Smith, and B. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing a life-threatening injury to another as a result of the person's driving, operating, or controlling a motor vehicle or vessel in a criminally negligent manner; exempting specified conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; establishing penalties, and a specified exemption, for a first violation of the Act which constitute a misdemeanor subject to imprisonment of up to 18 months or a maximum fine of $5,000 or both; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1114
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {422115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {422115/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 46
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-211.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM