Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retire in Maryland Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Cluster, Folden, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Kipke, Kittleman, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, Morgan, O'Donnell, Parrott, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Saab, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from specified retirement plans and unearned income sources within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for specified individuals who are at least 65 years old or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; repealing the limitation on the maximum amount allowed as a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified retirement income; applying the Act to taxable years after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0960 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/03/2016 Text - First - Retire in Maryland Act of 2016
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM