Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap Reduction
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Afzali, Arentz, Carozza, Corderman, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, Miele, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing from 110% to 105% the homestead property tax credit percentage for the State property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap Reduction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap Reduction
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM