Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a hearing on an appeal to a supervisor of assessments concerning the value or classification of a specified dwelling to occur no later than 120 days after the Department of Assessments and Taxation receives the appeal, unless the property owner requests a postponement; requiring the supervisor to give written notice of the final value or classification of a specified dwelling to the person who has appealed or filed a petition for review within 60 days after the hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {405365/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399834/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {405365/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {399834/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text - Chapter - Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-509, 14-511, 8-401, 8-404, 8-405, 8-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM