Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to provide that a violation of specified ordinances is punishable as a misdemeanor and enforced in a specified manner and to a specified extent and is a civil infraction and shall be prosecuted in a specified manner and to a specified extent; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0839
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-538, 12-618, 12-804, 13-703 )
(   9-1607, 9-1608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM