Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pendergrass, and V. Turner
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a specified judgment obtained in favor of a Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipient to be increased by a specified amount under specified circumstances; authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to collect from a Program recipient the full amount of specified payments in specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0502
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {496281/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {496281/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48A
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM