Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Aumann, Barkley, Branch, Carey, Chang, Cullison, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Jameson, Krimm, Morales, Stein, Turner, and Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the programs to be funded by the Universal Service Trust Fund; requiring the Secretary of Information Technology to certify the cost of the programs to be paid by the Universal Service Trust Fund; requiring the Public Service Commission to determine the amount of a specified monthly surcharge; establishing the Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program, operated by the Department of Aging, to regularly call the residence of an eligible participant to verify the participant's ability to receive specified notifications; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0248
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {253295/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {253295/1 Adopted 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Finance 42
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Text - Chapter - Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3A-101, 3A-501, 3A-506, 3A-701, 3A-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM