Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Ebersole, Frush, Hill, C. Howard, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, McIntosh, Morhaim, Proctor, Reznik, Tarlau, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable; establishing certain requirements and procedures relating to an application to the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to install or use electric vehicle recharging equipment; requiring certain owners of electric vehicle recharging equipment to be responsible for certain costs and disclosures; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0699 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-111.4, 11B-111.7 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM