Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, McKay, and B. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the defined term "required security" as it applies to motor vehicles in the State to include specified security for out-of-state motor vehicles.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1641 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {150718/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Proof of Insurance for Motor Vehicles Registered in Another State
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {150718/1 Adopted 37
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Finance 40
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required Security
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-101, 17-107, 17-110, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM