Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Angel, Atterbeary, Barve, Campos, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Gilchrist, Glenn, Hettleman, Hixson, Jalisi, Kelly, Kramer, Krebs, McComas, Metzgar, A. Miller, Moon, Pendergrass, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, for specified purposes relating to domestic violence, the definition of "person eligible for relief" to include an individual who has had a sexual relationship with a specified respondent within 1 year before filing of a specified petition; and establishing a specified exception to a provision that authorizes the court to include in a final protective order a requirement that specified individuals participate in specified counseling or a domestic violence program.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0775 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {272517/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments {272517/1 Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501, 4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM