Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, George, Guzzone, Kach, Luedtke, Niemann, Pendergrass, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, and F. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring all counties to participate in a specified income tax refund withholding program for individuals with outstanding warrants; requiring the Comptroller to conduct a specified study and submit a report to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; and repealing specified termination provisions.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0653
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935, 13-936, 13-937, 13-938 through 13-940 )
(   2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM