Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and Clarification
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified references to individual retirement accounts include traditional and Roth individual retirement accounts; clarifying that a member of the Employees' Pension System who resumes employment before a specified date may resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection if the employer participates in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; clarifying that the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit does not apply to employees of specified participating governmental units; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014, January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954663/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {954663/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-601, 21-602, 22-215, 22-217, 23-213, 23-215.1, 23-225, 23-308, 24-206, 24-401.1, 25-204, 26-205, 26-401.1, 28-205, 28-402, 29-302, 29-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM