Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Chang, Cullison, Gaines, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Hill, Korman, Lafferty, Lierman, Pena-Melnyk, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that when an appointing authority of a unit in the State Personnel Management System appoints an employee to a position in the skilled service or the professional service, the Secretary of Budget and Management shall require that the pay rate of each incumbent employee in the unit who is in the same classification as, and has a pay rate lower than, the newly appointed employee be adjusted to equal the pay rate of the newly appointed employee; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-103.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page