Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Washington, Ali, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, and Afzali
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a Maryland small or independent film entity to qualify as a film production entity under certain circumstances; altering a certain audit requirement to apply only to an entity with total direct costs that exceed $500,000; altering the amount of certain tax credit certificates that the Secretary of Commerce may issue under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {905566/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {905566/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Small or Independent Film Entities
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-730 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM